HI HB2691 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that hospice care shall only be provided by a licensed hospice care facility, care home, or foster home. Requires that a guardian of a person in a hospice home shall have the legal responsibility to advocate for the person until end of the person's life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hospice.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-06-20 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback