HI HB2675 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an appellate court to conduct a hearing when a conflict of interest pertaining to a judge or justice is alleged by motion of a party to any suit, action, or proceeding of the appellate court. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Judiciary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateRe-Referred to JDC/WAM.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 267).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback