HI HB266 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Entitles the small business regulatory review board to a separate line item within the budget of the department of business, economic development, and tourism.
Title
Small Business Regulatory Review Board; Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism; Line Item; Budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB12 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=266&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB266_.HTM |