HI HB2658 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts citizens of countries having a valid Compact of Free Association with the United States from the requirement that a driver's license of a legal immigrant expire no later than the legal immigrant's authorized period of stay in the United States. Requires the legal immigrant to provide proof of legal residence in the United States as defined by the Director of Transportation by rule.
Title
Relating To Driver's Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-18 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-18. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2658&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2658_.HTM |