HI HB265 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB265
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment for persons convicted of offenses based on the possession of methamphetamine and fentanyl.
Title
Relating To Crimes.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Rachele Fernandez Lamosao [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB265 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=265&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB265_.HTM |