HI HB265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB265
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits landlords from recovering possession of a dwelling unit from tenants if habitability of the premises is significantly impaired. Sets a tenant's liability for rent if habitability of the premises is significantly impaired. Provides remedies for retaliatory evictions.
Title
Relating To The Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB265 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
SB306 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
SB306 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=265&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB265_.HTM |