HI HB2638 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to contract a third-party entity to compile a report evaluating the agricultural land use potential of certain parcels of state-owned lands. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Land Use Potential.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2155 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.