HI HB261 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adjusts towing company charges and fees for vehicles left unattended or abandoned. Establishes a clean-up charge and documentation fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tow Truck Pricing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB650 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback