HI HB2607 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-09-12 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-09-12 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a measure for extending the reporting date of the 2010-2012 tax review commission and requests an additional $100,000 for fiscal year 2011-2012.
Title
Tax Review Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-09-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2869 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 41
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2607 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2607_.htm |