HI HB2595 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes general obligation bonds and appropriates funds for improvements to irrigation systems statewide. (HB2595 HD1)
Title
General Obligation Bonds; Irrigation Systems Improvements ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 586-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-18 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |