HI HB2588 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits lessees who sell or transfer land from obtaining subsequent leases of the same class of land unless the subsequent lease is acquired pursuant to section 209 of the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, as amended, or the prior lease interest held by the lessee was a partial interest held with another lessee or lessees. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 890-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 610-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Say, Yamane. |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-13-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 108-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-31-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2389 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.