HI HB2587 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 011, 05/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the period in which a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from 3/31/2018 to 3/31/2019. (HB2587 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateAct 011, 05/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
2018-05-07HouseAct 011, on 05/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere. 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 104-18).
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 104-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Nishihara, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2018-04-24SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 662).
2018-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827).
2018-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Nishihara, K. Kahele Co-Chairs.
2018-04-23HouseHouse Conferees Added: Representative Hashimoto added as Conferee.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Ward.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 746) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3618) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3142) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara.
2018-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 10:00AM in conference room 414.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
2018-03-08SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-08SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 356).
2018-03-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2).
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-02-16HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola.
2018-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3088 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback