HI HB2582 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board to establish reasonable fees for written appeals and administrative costs. Establishes a Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board Special Fund. Provides exemptions from fees for public agencies and for good cause. Authorizes the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to make rules. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB2582 HD2)
Title
Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Marumoto, Pine. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-14-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ERB. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2012-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-03-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to LAB, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2844 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.