HI HB2578 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts prekindergarten-only public charter schools from certain provisions affecting charter schools relating to funding and finance, the use of the weighted student formula, athletics, enrollment, computer science courses and content, and enrollment in industry-credential programs. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Early Learning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-31 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |