HI HB2577 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires patient approval prior to the delivery of any medical services through telehealth. Prohibits health insurance companies from limiting the setting where telehealth services are provided or requiring in-person contact between a patient and physician before the delivery of telehealth services.
Title
Telehealth; Telemedicine; Health Insurance; Physicians
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-04 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2469 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPH, JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2577&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2577_.HTM |