HI HB2575 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new chapter for rent stabilization applicable to all rental units located in structures over a certain age. (HB2575 HD1)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2). |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashem, San Buenaventura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2018-01-31 | House | Re-referred to HSG, CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |