HI HB2575 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Simplifies the renewable portfolio standards law by establishing maximum fossil fuel standards instead. Allows the Public Utilities Commission to establish reasonable interim percentages, variances, and penalties.
Title
Renewable Portfolio Standards; Public Utilities Commission; Fossil Fuel Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2575&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2575_.HTM |