HI HB2573 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents the Public Utilities Commission from approving power purchase agreements that prohibit the sale of energy to third parties or require the utility consent to the sale of energy to third parties.
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Power Purchase Agreement ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2573&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2573_.HTM |