HI HB257 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits the retail sale of unpasteurized milk under certain conditions. Permits the sale of unpasteurized milk for animal consumption. Defines unpasteurized milk. Permits milk producers to establish cow share programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Dairy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-27HouseThe committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2017-01-26HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-01-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-27-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2017-01-23HouseReferred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 1
2017-01-20HousePass First Reading
2017-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback