HI HB2566 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires vehicles on any two-lane roadway that provides for two-way movement of traffic, proceeding at less than the speed limit, where passing or overtaking another vehicle is not possible or permitted, and a line of five or more vehicles has formed immediately behind the vehicle, to move off the roadway at the nearest location where sufficient space exists for trailing vehicles to overtake. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Traffic Safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:15AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2679 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRS, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback