HI HB2555 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WLA/CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Board of Agriculture to regulate the growing of industrial hemp for research purposes. Requires the regulation of growers selling industrial hemp. Makes an appropriation. (HB2555 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Hemp; Private Growers; Authorization; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateReferred to WLA/CPH, JDL/WAM.
2016-03-08SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-08SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 151).
2016-03-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 762-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
2016-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2016-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
2016-02-19HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2016-02-16HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson.
2016-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-16 3:00PM in conference room 325.
2016-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-12-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-08HouseRe-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 11
2016-02-01HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2016-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-26HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback