HI HB2551 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers who incur certain expenses for manufacturing products in Hawaii. Applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016. Sunsets January 1, 2023.
Title
Manufacturing; Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2551&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2551_.HTM |