HI HB2551 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the purpose of the Disability and Communication Access Board Special Fund to allow for the receipt of various fees, including fees from the credentialing of interpreters.
Title
Disability and Communication Access Board Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2813 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 272, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1375).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2551 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2551_.htm |