HI HB2522 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes general fund appropriations of $20,000,000 for fiscal year 20112012 and $43,700,000 for fiscal year 20122013 to recapitalize the Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund and makes general fund appropriations of $55,000,000 for fiscal year 20112012 and $56,000,000 for fiscal year 20122013 to recapitalize the Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund.
Title
Appropriations; Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund; Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-14-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2784 (Same As) 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2522 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2522_.htm |