HI HB2520 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals and reestablishes the stadium development district under the jurisdiction of the stadium authority. Establishes the stadium development special fund. Expands the powers and duties of the stadium authority. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Stadium Development District.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3167 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2520&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2520_.HTM |