HI HB252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 235, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a provisional license for speech pathologists. Takes effect on 01/01/2022. (HB252 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Speech Pathology.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 235, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
2019-07-09HouseAct 235, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Ward.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 667) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1773) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 21).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Say, Ward.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB307 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback