HI HB2511 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides funds to the department of Hawaiian home lands to pursue a multi-pronged approach to eliminating its waitlist. Requires the department of Hawaiian home lands to develop a strategic plan to address applicant preferences. Requires an annual report. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 959). |
2022-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 255-22). |
2022-05-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 255-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Eli, Holt, Tam, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 803). |
2022-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-22 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-26 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke added as Co-Chair. Representative Holt discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member. |
2022-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-22 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-22 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-22 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-22 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Holt Co-Chairs; Eli, Tam, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Keohokalole, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 862) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3943) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Wakai, Fevella. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-17-22 1:01PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 1:01PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 354). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-03-22 2:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-22. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 376-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, Ward. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3359 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24