HI HB251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for laptop or tablet computers to be used by teachers and students for digital teaching and learning. (HB251 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 154).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 644) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:35PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback