HI HB2507 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Resources Development to: (1) conduct a remote work study; (2) review any recent remote work studies done by the counties; (3) develop and administer a remote work program; and (4) submit the study to the Legislature prior to the convening of the Regular Session of 2025. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Remote Work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3296 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Action Plan
Appropriation ($)
DHRD
Establishment
Expenditure Ceiling
Position
Program
Remote Work Study
Report
Appropriation ($)
DHRD
Establishment
Expenditure Ceiling
Position
Program
Remote Work Study
Report
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2507&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2507_.HTM |