HI HB2498 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee(s) on HUS/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee(s) on HUS/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a homeless care residence program to provide financial assistance to households providing temporary housing and care to a homeless relative. Requires that providers undergo certification and inspection by the department of human services and caps program participation at twelve months.
Title
Homelessness; Homeless Care Residence
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HUS/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-16 8:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to HUS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2498&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2498_.HTM |