HI HB2483 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends county zoning power for single-family and multifamily residential dwelling units. Requires the City and County of Honolulu to amend rules for planning and permitting. (HB2483 HD1)
Title
Relating To Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 195-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |