HI HB2465 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals and transfers the unencumbered balances of or amends various non-general funds and accounts recommended by the Auditor in Auditor's Report no. 15-19. (SD1)
Title
Non-General Funds; Repeal; Transfer of Balances
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Jordan Chair; Cullen, Tokioka, Pouha. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 615) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 312). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |