HI HB2464 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a fine of up to $1,000 for the operation of a vehicle with .05 or more but less than .08 grams of alcohol in breath or blood. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Use Of Intoxicants While Operating A Vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 333). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 345-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |