HI HB2457 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an earned credit certificate for contractors in public works projects who meet certain apprenticeship requirements. Clarifies information that a bidder must disclose in a competitive sealed bid for public works projects. (HB2457 HD1)
Title
Public Works; Earned Credit Certificate; Apprenticeship
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-16 5:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 104-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Tupola. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-05-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |