HI HB2449 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state ethics commission to provide a confidential copy of board and commission members' most recent financial disclosures to all other members of the filer's board or commission and executive director. Requires the recipients of the disclosures to maintain the confidentiality of the disclosures and destroy disclosures of members upon expiration of their terms.
Title
Boards and Commissions; Financial Disclosures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB860 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2449&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2449_.HTM |