HI HB2445 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii tourism authority to maintain the confidentiality of competitively sensitive information; aligns performance goals with the authority's strategic plan goals; requires periodic reports; preserves certain autonomy provisions of Act 58, SLH 2004. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Tourism Authority; Marketing; Autonomy
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) Reported from TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2737) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Galuteria, Tsutsui, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to TSM, JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 199). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Berg voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Sagum. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-18-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Reported from TCI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committees on TCI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Manahan, Tokioka, Choy, Evans, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Berg, McKelvey, Takai, Wakai, Wooley. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 02-01-10 8:45 AM in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |