HI HB2444 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Conditions the authority of a county whose population is greater than five hundred thousand to exercise state housing powers upon a county's continued compliance with provisions regarding the acceptance of the dedication of infrastructure and public highways in affordable housing developments. Amends various provisions relating to the dedication of infrastructure to a county. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3336) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 89). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |