HI HB2443 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of defense for fiscal year 2021-2022 to provide relief from flooding events. Provides for the lapse of the funds on an unspecified date. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Disaster Relief.
Sponsors
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-15-22 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2156 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.