HI HB2439 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii water resources research center to research and develop specialized equipment for the removal of plastic marine debris. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from LHE/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Todd. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, Tokioka. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/EEP on Friday, 02-07-20 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Plastic Marine Debris
Specialized Equipment
University of Hawaii
Water Resources Research Center
Plastic Marine Debris
Specialized Equipment
University of Hawaii
Water Resources Research Center