HI HB243 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709), recommending passage on Third Reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each executive branch department to: identify existing and planned facilities that are vulnerable to sea level rise, flooding impacts, and natural hazards; assess options for mitigation impacts of sea level rise to existing and planned facilities; establish staff level points of contact to improve interagency coordination for sea level rise adaptation, flooding, and resilience; and submit annual reports to the governor, legislature, and Hawaii climate change mitigation and adaptation commission. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sea Level Rise Adaptation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tokioka.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Tuesday, 02-16-21 11:00AM in House conference room 430 & 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB371 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback