HI HB2407 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to PSM, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to PSM, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a process for electric utilities to develop and submit wildfire protection plans to the Public Utilities Commission for approval and allow the recovery of related costs and expenses through securitization, while avoiding a disproportionate impact on a specific ratepayer or county. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Wildfire Risk Mitigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN/WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 137). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Poepoe; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-15 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2024-02-15 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Gates. |
2024-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JHA on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 190-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JHA. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:05AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-29 | House | Re-referred to WAL/EEP, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3096 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Subjects
Electric Utilities
Mitigation
Protection
Public Utilities Commission
Risk Protection Plans
Securitization
Wildfires
Mitigation
Protection
Public Utilities Commission
Risk Protection Plans
Securitization
Wildfires