HI HB2396 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 123, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 123, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the limit on revenues collected by the Special Enforcement Section of the Department of Taxation that are deposited into the Tax Administration Special Fund. Authorizes the use of Tax Administration Special Fund moneys to fund support staff positions in the Special Enforcement Section. Authorizes the Department of Taxation to establish 5 full-time equivalent (5.0 FTE) positions within the Special Enforcement Section. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Tax Administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 123, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 123, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2018-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Quinlan excused (2). |
2018-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 665). |
2018-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-27-18. |
2018-04-18 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-18-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Ward. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2018-03-27 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-23-18. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3026) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 336). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2823 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 34