HI HB2392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 9).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 9).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to provide funds for Department of Public Safety to reimburse the Department of Human Services for specialty out-of-facility care and to pay the increased costs for pharmacy services. (HB2392 HD1)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 9). |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-08-18 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2819 (Same As) 2018-04-03 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.