HI HB2392 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Hawaii income and estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2015, and makes technical, nonsubstantive amendments.
Title
Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2015; Income Tax; Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2921 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Act 033, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2392&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2392_.HTM |