HI HB2389 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the kindergarten entry cut-off date established in Act 178, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, from July 31 to December 31 of the school year. Effective June 30, 2014.
Title
Kindergarten; Entry Cut-Off
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2389&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2389_.HTM |