HI HB2383 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where public access is required as a condition of a subdivision, either the county must accept dedication of and maintain the access or identify an entity to own and maintain the access. Authorizes the county to require the subdivider to establish a stewardship fund for maintenance purposes. Takes effect 1/1/2023.
Title
Relating To Public Access.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2350 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2383&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2383_.HTM |