HI HB2373 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 135, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 135, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health, under specified circumstances, to disclose information in public health statistics records to Department employees acting within the scope of their employment for approved research purposes upon approval by the Department's Institutional Review Committee. Establishes conditions under which those records may be disclosed with and without informed consent. (HB2373 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Sharing Of Vital Statistics Records With Department Of Health Program Employees For Approved Research Purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 135, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 135, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 52-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 52-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 717) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3544) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3077) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 682-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2800 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).