HI HB237 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state ethics commission to offer a more comprehensive ethics training course that is to be completed by persons subject to section 84-41, HRS, within thirty days of taking office or starting employment and once every four years thereafter. Requires all persons required to file a financial disclosure statement pursuant to section 84-17(d), HRS, to attend an in-person ethics course and all members of a board, as defined in section 92-2 and not included in section 84-17(d); state employees responsible for procurement; state employees who administer state contracts; and state employees who regulate or inspect private organizations to complete an online ethics course. Takes effect on July 1, 2016.
Title
State Ethics Commission; Mandatory Online and In-person Ethics Training Course; Public Officials; Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB290 (Same As) 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=237&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB237_.HTM |