HI HB2367 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the party responsible for renewable portfolio standards support and reporting on certain energy matters shall be the Chief Energy Officer of the Hawaii State Energy Office. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 449-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3056 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to EET, JDC.