HI HB2363 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 187, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 187, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes employers under certain circumstances from providing Temporary Disability Insurance (TDI) coverage for themselves if they perform services for their own corporation, limited liability company (LLC), limited liability partnership (LLP), partnership, or sole proprietorship. Allows the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to receive electronic reports of injuries and other Workers' Compensation required reports. Increases the penalties for not having TDI coverage, for failure to make correct or timely benefit payments, for terminating such benefits, for failure to file medical reports, for employer's failure to provide copies of requested medical reports, for not having Workers' Compensation coverage, and for the deduction of premium payment from employee wages. (HB2363 CD1)
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance Exclusions; Workers' Compensation Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Act 187, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289). |
2016-07-01 | House | Act 187, on 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 145-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 145-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, K.Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, McKelvey, Keohokalole, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Baker, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, McKelvey, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Aquino, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3481) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDL/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3051) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 39). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 645-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-09-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2892 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to JDL, WAM.